Castillo v. Franciscan Alliance, Inc.
Plaintiff: LUCYNA CASTILLO
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00166
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Franciscan Alliance, Inc.. (Adolay, Amy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Franciscan Alliance, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Franciscan Alliance, Inc..(Adolay, Amy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Franciscan Alliance, Inc. ; answer due by 07/01/2019. (Holler, Blake)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake P Holler on behalf of Franciscan Alliance, Inc. (Holler, Blake)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J Adolay on behalf of Franciscan Alliance, Inc. (Adolay, Amy)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Franciscan Alliance, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
May 7, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of LUCYNA CASTILLO (Dutkanych, Andrew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franciscan Alliance, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3883876.), filed by LUCYNA CASTILLO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dutkanych, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Franciscan Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: Amy J Adolay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCYNA CASTILLO
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?