McGriff et al v. New Horizon Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: United Brotherhood of Carpenters Apprenticeship Training Fund of North America, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Trust Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Greg Hauswald, Douglas J McCarron, Mark McGriff, William Nix, Doug Robinson and Joe Coar
Defendant: David B. Ivie, NEW HORIZON CONSTRUCTION, INC. and New Horizon Contruction Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00167
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *New Horizon Contruction Inc and David B. Ivie d/b/a/ New Horizon Construction Inc* regarding #7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Doug Robinson, Douglas J McCarron, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Greg Hauswald, Mark McGriff, Joe Coar, William Nix (nae)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendants New Horizon Construction, Inc. and David B. Ivie d/b/a New Horizon Construction Inc. by Plaintiffs Joe Coar, Greg Hauswald, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Douglas J McCarron, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, William Nix, Doug Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Paul T. Berkowitz)(Berkowitz, Paul)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Doug Robinson, Joe Coar, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, William Nix, Greg Hauswald, Douglas J McCarron. David B. Ivie served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Berkowitz, Paul)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Doug Robinson, Joe Coar, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, Mark McGriff, William Nix, Greg Hauswald, Douglas J McCarron. New Horizon Contruction Inc served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Berkowitz, Paul)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David B. Ivie, New Horizon Contruction Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lns)
May 7, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (lns)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Moss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moss, Thomas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T Berkowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berkowitz, Paul)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3884141.), filed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Trust Fund, United Brotherhood of Carpenters Apprenticeship Training Fund of North America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berkowitz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGriff et al v. New Horizon Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Brotherhood of Carpenters Apprenticeship Training Fund of North America
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Hauswald
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas J McCarron
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McGriff
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nix
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Robinson
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Coar
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW HORIZON CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Horizon Contruction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?