Woods v. Walmart
Plaintiff: Martez Armond Woods
Defendant: Walmart
Case Number: 2:2019cv00172
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Amend Complaint and Implead Third Party and ORDERS Plaintiff to file his amended Complaint, currently on the docket as an attachment to the instant Motion, by 07/08/2019, and to properly serve it on all Defendants as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 06/27/2019. (jat)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Martez Armond Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Draft Amended Complaint)(Snow, Nicholas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee paid by Attorney Nicholas Snow $ 400.00, receipt number INN2018593 (shk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Snow on behalf of Martez Armond Woods (Snow, Nicholas)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENIED #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. GRANTS Martez Armond Woods until 6/25/2019, to pay the filing fee; and CAUTIONS Plaintiff, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/22/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Martez Armond Woods. (rmf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copy of summons forms and 1 copy of USM-285 forms against Walmart, filed by Martez Armond Woods. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM-285 Form) (rmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martez Armond Woods
Represented By: Nicholas A Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?