Navas v. Grand Atlas Property Management Company

Plaintiff: Juan Navas
Defendant: Grand Atlas Property Management Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00190
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:117
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Order Dismissing Case and #4 Clerks Judgment. (bas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7000 1670 0012 9260 9833) (bas)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/13/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7000 1670 0012 9260 9833)(bas)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to send Plaintiff a blank AO-239 form with cause number along with 2 blank summons forms and 1 blank USM-285 form. GRANTING Plaintiff until 6/10/2019 to either pay the filing fee or return the aforementioned forms properly completed and CAUTIONS him that if he fails to respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/21/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in order)(bas) Modified on 5/23/2019 (bas).
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Grand Atlas Property Management Company filed by Juan Navas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (No proposed summons, USM-285 forms, or Motion for IFP provided) (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navas v. Grand Atlas Property Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Navas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Atlas Property Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?