Jafferali-Whitehead v. Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC

Plaintiff: Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead
Defendant: Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00199
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/17/2019. (smb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC, filed by Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - Collection Letter)(Philipps, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead. Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Philipps, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Stidham on behalf of Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC (Stidham, Christopher)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B Elwood on behalf of Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC (Elwood, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
May 28, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Philipps on behalf of Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead (Philipps, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Philipps on behalf of Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead (Philipps, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3904248.), filed by Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jafferali-Whitehead v. Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhame, Elwood, McClure, PC
Represented By: Christopher D Stidham
Represented By: Kenneth B Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Jafferali-Whitehead
Represented By: Mary E Philipps
Represented By: David J Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?