Moore et al v. Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: M Squared Enterprises, Inc. and Steven Moore
Defendant: Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc and Reviva, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00224
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Colette L Kopon on behalf of Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc (Kopon, Colette)
August 2, 2019 Filing 62 Docket Annotation. Lead counsel for all parties notified about outstanding individual attorney admissions in the Northern District of Indiana. Counsel of record indicate they can have paperwork submitted by 8/9/2019. (smb)
June 19, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 61 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-03762. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 18, 2019 Filing 60 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Indiana the electronic file. (las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/17/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant Magiera Diesel's motion to dismiss or transfer #25 is granted in part, denied as moot in part, and reserved for the transferee court in part. This case is transferred to the Northern District of Indiana. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer forthwith. The status hearing set for 6/20/2019 #57 is stricken. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #56 is stricken and re-set for 6/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 5/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported that, contrary to what the court understood from a communication in late March, the case is not close to settlement. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to refer the matter to Magistrate Judge for settlement conference #53 is denied. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE by Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc to motion to transfer case #53 (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Calvita J. Frederick for presentment of motion to transfer case #53 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Moore to transfer case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 2/27/2019 #51 is stricken and re-set for 4/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
January 27, 2019 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 1/29/2019 #50 is stricken and re-set for 2/27/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Oral argument held on the pending motion #25 . The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY by Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc to motion to dismiss #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The 12/6/2018 status hearing #47 is reset from 9:00 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. The court will have questions regarding the fully briefed motion to dismiss/transfer #25 . TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 24, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Unopposed motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of motion to dismiss #45 is granted. The time for Defendant Magiera Diesel to file its response brief is extended to 12/4/2018. Motion hearing set for 11/28/2018 #46 is stricken. Status hearing set for 12/5/2018 #37 is stricken and reset for 12/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Colette Lynn Kopon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #45 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/28/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION by Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc for extension of time to file response/reply (Unopposed) (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by Steven Moore re response in opposition to motion #42 , memorandum in opposition to motion #43 OF FILING Res and Memo (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Steven Moore in Opposition to motion to dismiss #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Detail Report, #2 Exhibit Sheafer Letter 06 14)(Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE by Steven Moorein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc to dismiss Or In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue #25 (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file excess pages #38 and motion to file instanter #39 is granted are granted. Plaintiff shall file his memorandum as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 11/15/2018 #40 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Calvita J. Frederick for presentment of motion to file instanter #39 , motion for leave to file excess pages #38 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Moore to file instanter Response and Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Res to MTD, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opp to MTD)(Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Moore for leave to file excess pages (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #35 is granted. The time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Magiera Diesel's motion to dismiss/transfer is extended to 11/9/2018; reply due by 11/27/2018. Motion hearing set for 11/8/2018 #36 is stricken. Status hearing set for 11/26/2018 #32 is stricken and re-set for 12/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Calvita J. Frederick for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #35 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Moore for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion #27 , motion to dismiss #25 (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion for additional time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #32 is granted. The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Magiera Diesel's motion #25 is extended to 11/5/2018; reply due by 11/19/2018. Motion hearing set for 10/25/2018 #33 is stricken. Status hearing set for 11/15/2018 #21 is stricken and re-set for 11/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (cc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Calvita J. Frederick for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #32 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/25/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Moore for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #25 (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Defendant Diesel Injection Service's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer venue #25 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs' response due by 10/22/2018; reply due by 11/5/2018. By agreement, the MIDP disclosure deadline is stricken and will be re-set at a later date. No initial status report need be filed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #24 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 29 JURY Demand (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM filed by Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc against Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc . by Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc in support of motion to dismiss #25 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Colette Lynn Kopon for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #24 , motion to dismiss #25 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc to dismiss Or In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14984530. (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:MIDP disclosures shall be served by 10/24/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #19 is granted. The time for Defendant Diesel Injection Service to respond to the operative complaint is extended to 9/24/2018. Motion hearing set for 8/30/2018 #20 is stricken. Status hearing set for 9/5/2018 #10 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 11/8/2018.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Colette Lynn Kopon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #19 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc by Colette Lynn Kopon (Kopon, Colette) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc by Andrew Kopon, Jr (Kopon, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 Defendant Reviva, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Reviva, Inc.(Schneider, Meaghan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Reviva, Inc. by Meaghan Lindsey Schneider (Schneider, Meaghan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Reviva, Inc. by Omar S. Odland (Odland, Omar) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to DIESEL INJECTION SERVICE COMPANY, INC on 06/27/2018 by Plaintiff Steven Moore. Waiver of service due by 8/27/2018. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to REVIVA, INC on 05/31/2018 by Plaintiff Steven Moore. Waiver of service due by 7/30/2018. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to MAGIERA DIESEL INJ SERV INC on 05/31/2018 by Plaintiff Steven Moore. Waiver of service due by 7/30/2018. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The docket does not reflect that summonses have been issued, let alone served. Accordingly, status hearing set for 8/1/2018 #9 is stricken and re-set for 9/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs are reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m).Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's jurisdictional addendum #7 having established, at least for pleading purposes, that the parties are completely diverse, the order to show cause #5 is discharged. Status hearing set for 6/26/2018 #5 is stricken and re-set for 8/1/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The court notes that the docket does not reflect that summonses have been issued, let alone served, and reminds Plaintiff of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m). Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Steven Moore re amended document #7 Notice of Filing (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED Jurisdictional Addendum (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:On the court's motion, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 6/15/2018 why this case should not be dismissed for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Although the complaint premises subject matter jurisdiction under the diversity statute, 28 U.S.C. 1332, it does not properly allege the citizenship of Plaintiff M Squared Enterprises, Inc. or Defendant Reviva, Inc. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1) ("a corporation shall be deemed to be a citizen of every State or foreign state by which it has been incorporated and of the State or foreign state where it has its principal place of business"). Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a Jurisdictional Addendum that properly alleges the citizenship of those parties. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this case for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Status hearing set for 6/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
May 31, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez f. (ec, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Receipt # 0752-14529734 filed by Steven Moore; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Invoice, #2 Exhibit B Warranty)(Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Moore by Calvita J. Frederick (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 1 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14529734. (Frederick, Calvita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magiera Diesel Injection Services, Inc
Represented By: Ridley M. Sandidge, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Kopon, Jr.
Represented By: Colette Lynn Kopon
Represented By: Colette L Kopon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reviva, Inc.
Represented By: Meaghan Lindsey Schneider
Represented By: Omar S. Odland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Squared Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Moore
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?