Mobley v. Eagle Site Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jamaal Mobley
Defendant: Bruce M Rackouski and Eagle Site Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00246
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamaal Mobley. Bruce M Rackouski served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hunt, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamaal Mobley. Eagle Site Services LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Hunt, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eagle Site Services LLC, Bruce M Rackouski. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
July 9, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Hunt on behalf of Jamaal Mobley (Hunt, Robert)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3942997.), filed by Jamaal Mobley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hunt, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley v. Eagle Site Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal Mobley
Represented By: Robert J Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce M Rackouski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Site Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?