American General Life Insurance Company v. Gensel et al
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Anna Joy Gensel, Susan Kay Gensel, Mary Elizabeth Gensel and Karen Sue Hobgood
Case Number: 2:2019cv00270
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Susan Kay Gensel. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Kersting, Edna)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American General Life Insurance Company. Mary Elizabeth Gensel waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American General Life Insurance Company. Karen Sue Hobgood waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American General Life Insurance Company. Anna Joy Gensel waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
July 30, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE (kjp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company. (Kersting, Edna)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader and for declaratory relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3961860.), filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Policy Data Page), #2 Exhibit B (Policy information pages), #3 Exhibit C (Change of beneficiary form), #4 Exhibit D (September 11, 2015 letter), #5 Exhibit E (Service request form), #6 Exhibit F (Contract endorsement), #7 Exhibit G (Change of Beneficiary form), #8 Exhibit H (November 5, 2017 change of Beneficiary form), #9 Exhibit I (November 10, 2017 letter), #10 Exhibit J (April 29, 2019 fax), #11 Exhibit K (Claimant's statement), #12 Exhibit L (Claimant's statement), #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kersting, Edna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. Gensel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Joy Gensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kay Gensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Gensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Sue Hobgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna S Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?