United States v. 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00313
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/SET HEARING re #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/28/2019 12:30 PM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin w/the Court initiating the conference. Any change in contact info is to be provided to the case manager sue_brown@innd.usourts.gov no earlier than 48 business hours in advance. Text entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/16/2019. (smb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stracci, Paul)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/17/2019. (smb)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant's Answer to be filed by 10/11/2019. Any claim of interest in, or right against, the property to be filed by 10/28/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/13/2019. No pdf attached. (sa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT. (Stracci, Paul)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #2 Warrant Issued (Attachments: #1 Direct Notice of Judicial Forfeiture Proceedings)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT for ARREST IN REM issued. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jat)
August 21, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE). (jat)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Rem against 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons /Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Orest S Szewciw - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Orest S Szewciw - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Chevrolet Traverse LT
Represented By: Paul G Stracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?