Porter v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Mr. Andre S Porter and Andre Porter
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company and Illinois Central Railroad Company dba CN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00340
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Illinois Central Railroad Company dba CN. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andre Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Summons)(Zamudio, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wilson PHV, Johner)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Wilson PHV, Johner)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Wilson PHV, Johner)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Johner T Wilson PHV, III for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/15/2019. (ace)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jessica E Chang PHV for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/15/2019. (ace)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/10/2019. (tc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company (Gumbiner, Krysta)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Johner T. Wilson III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Grand Truck Western Railroad Company d/b/a CN. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4031580 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #2 IL Certificate of Good Standing) (ace).
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Attorney Jessica E. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Grand Truck Western Railroad Company d/b/a CN. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4031425 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #2 IL Certificate of Good Standing) (ace).
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Porter. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zamudio, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
September 10, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (jat)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zamudio on behalf of Andre S Porter (Zamudio, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4001122.), filed by Andre S Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zamudio, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Johner T Wilson PHV, III
Represented By: Jessica E Chang PHV
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company dba CN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Andre S Porter
Represented By: Daniel Zamudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Porter
Represented By: Daniel Zamudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?