Three Floyds Brewing LLC v. Trachtenbroit et al
Plaintiff: Three Floyds Brewing LLC
Defendant: Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC and Lawrence Trachtenbroit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00363
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension. Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/23/2019. If Defendants file a motion in response to the Complaint, Plaintiff may request additional time to respond when that motion is filed. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/20/2019. No pdf attached. (sa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Agreed) by Defendant Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC. (Judge, Stephen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 11:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/18/2019. (smb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/18/2019. (smb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting relief requested in #8 Defendants' Notice of Initial Extension. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead by 11/22/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/18/2019. No pdf attached. (sa)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC, Lawrence Trachtenbroit (LaDue, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Agreed Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaintuntil 11/22/19 by Defendants Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC, Lawrence Trachtenbroit. (Judge, Stephen) Modified dkt text and term mtn and set answer due dates on 10/18/2019 (kjp).
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC. (Judge, Stephen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Judge on behalf of Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC, Lawrence Trachtenbroit (Judge, Stephen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC, Lawrence Trachtenbroit. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mrm)
September 25, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added (NEW CASE). (mrm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn A Rice on behalf of Three Floyds Brewing LLC (Rice, Glenn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter S Plotkin on behalf of Three Floyds Brewing LLC (Plotkin, Carter)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4017674.), filed by Three Floyds Brewing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to Lawrence Trachtenbroit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Patent Trademark Cover Sheet)(Plotkin, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Three Floyds Brewing LLC v. Trachtenbroit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three Floyds Brewing LLC
Represented By: Carter S Plotkin
Represented By: Glenn A Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd's Spiked Beverages LLC
Represented By: Stephen M Judge
Represented By: John D LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Trachtenbroit
Represented By: Stephen M Judge
Represented By: John D LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?