Otero et al v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.
Plaintiff: Zachary Johnson and Luis Otero
Defendant: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00396
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co..(Kandyba, Mary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/20/2019. (tc)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/25/2019. (tc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT #14 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace).
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A DeVries on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (DeVries, Edward)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT DE#13 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/12/2019. (tc)
November 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer ddl reset to 12/6/2019. (tc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.. (DeVries, Edward)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.. (DeVries, Edward) Modified on 11/8/2019 to reflect document is not a motion (tc).
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A DeVries on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (DeVries, Edward) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#12 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace).
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#11 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace).
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burns, Charles)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Otero, Zachary Johnson. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Huffman-Gottschling, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachment: #1 Summons reflecting Northen District of Indiana - emailed to Attorney). (nal)
October 15, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (nal)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Huffman-Gottschling on behalf of Zachary Johnson, Luis Otero (Huffman-Gottschling, David)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4034816.), filed by Luis Otero, Zachary Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Huffman-Gottschling, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otero et al v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Johnson
Represented By: David G Huffman-Gottschling
Represented By: Charles P Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Otero
Represented By: David G Huffman-Gottschling
Represented By: Charles P Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.
Represented By: Mary Louise Kandyba
Represented By: Edward A DeVries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?