Mileusnic v. PennyMac Loan Services et al
Appellant: John Mileusnic
Appellee: Capital One Auto Finance, AIS Portfolio Services, LP, Paul R Chael, Planet Home Lending, LLC and PennyMac Loan Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00427
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Appellee's BRIEF by Paul R Chael. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/24/2020. (Hoham, Julia)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPENDIX To Brief of Appellant by John Mileusnic. (rmf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 Document with legible banners) (rmf).
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF of Appellant by John Mileusnic. (rmf)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY COURT documents received by Clerk. (kjp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M Hoham on behalf of Paul R Chael (Hoham, Julia)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of filing APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT pursuant to Rule 8003(d) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-20831., filed by John Mileusnic.(jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #1 Notice of Transmittal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (jss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mileusnic v. PennyMac Loan Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Mileusnic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Capital One Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AIS Portfolio Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul R Chael
Represented By: Julia M Hoham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Planet Home Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PennyMac Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?