Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shanise N. Williams
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00445
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Atty Ham'd Div served on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (kjp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the USMS to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/3/2019. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
November 26, 2019 Judge Damon R Leichty added. (NEW CASE) (IFP MOTION PENDING). (rmf)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shanise N. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #2 Supplement Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons Commissioner, #4 Supplement Commissioner, #5 Supplement U. S. Attorney, #6 Supplement U. S. Attorney)(Horn, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by Shanise N. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Attorney General of U.S., #2 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Horn, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanise N. Williams
Represented By: John Edward Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?