Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Backstage of Indiana LLC
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., THE MUSIC FORCE, LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING, LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., TEES PUBLISHING, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., AMAZEMENT MUSIC, TONK MUSIC, INC., Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Tonk Music Inc, Music Force The, Tees Publishing Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc and Interior Music Corp
Defendant: BACKSTAGE OF INDIANA, LLC d/b/a BACKSTAGE ON BROADWAY, MARCELL JACKSON and Backstage of Indiana LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00010
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marcell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shk)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Marcell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Law Firm Name (Wimberg, April)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by April A Wimberg on behalf of Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Gregmark Music Inc, Interior Music Corp, Lindseyanne Music Co Inc, Lord and Walker Publishing, Music Force The, Prodisc Music Company, Tees Publishing Inc, Tonk Music Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Wimberg, April)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Backstage of Indiana LLC, Marcell Jackson. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
January 10, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZEMENT MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING, PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, TEES PUBLISHING, INC., THE MUSIC FORCE, TONK MUSIC, INC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Broadcast Music, Inc. for AMAZEMENT MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING, PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, TEES PUBLISHING, INC., THE MUSIC FORCE, TONK MUSIC, INC., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp... (Wimberg, April)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4111534.), filed by LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC., TEES PUBLISHING, INC., AMAZEMENT MUSIC, THE MUSIC FORCE, PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., INTERIOR MUSIC CORP., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., GREGMARK MUSIC, INC., TONK MUSIC, INC., LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Backstage of Indiana LLC dba Backstage on Broadway, #4 Proposed Summons Marcell Jackson)(Wimberg, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Backstage of Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MUSIC FORCE
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORD AND WALKER PUBLISHING
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSEYANNE MUSIC CO., INC.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRODISC MUSIC COMPANY
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERIOR MUSIC CORP.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEES PUBLISHING, INC.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGMARK MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAZEMENT MUSIC
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONK MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindseyanne Music Co Inc
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregmark Music Inc
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonk Music Inc
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Force The
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tees Publishing Inc
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp
Represented By: April A Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BACKSTAGE OF INDIANA, LLC d/b/a BACKSTAGE ON BROADWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCELL JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backstage of Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?