Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation v. Fairley et al
Plaintiff: Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation
Defendant: Toddrick Fairley and LTI Trucking Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00055
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation. LTI Trucking Services, Inc served on 3/4/20, answer due 3/25/20 (Cullinan, Patrick)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation. Toddrick Fairley served on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Cullinan, Patrick)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Toddrick Fairley, LTI Trucking Services, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
February 10, 2020 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (jat)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Cullinan on behalf of Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation (Cullinan, Patrick)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Toddrick Fairley, LTI Trucking Services, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4140415.), filed by Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Toddrick Fairley, #3 Proposed Summons LTI Trucking Services, Inc.)(Cullinan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation v. Fairley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toddrick Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTI Trucking Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niehoff Trucking, Incorporation
Represented By: Patrick J Cullinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?