Augustine v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sara Augustine
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company d/b/a State Farm and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00064
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Due to ongoing uncertainty relating to the COVID-19 and related Coronavirus pandemic and pursuant to General Order 2020-05 and 2020-06 the Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2020 is RESET to 5/1/2020 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/25/2020. Text entry only. (tc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bradley, Galen)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Court GRANTS #8 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 is RESET to 3/27/2020 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. The conference will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Rodovich's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/10/2020. Text entry only. (tc)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Bradley, Galen) Modified on 3/6/2020 to update docket text. Document filed in wrong case. Motion termed (shk).
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Bradley, Galen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/24/2020. (tc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/3/2020. (tc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Bradley, Galen)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/18/2020. (tc)
February 13, 2020 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Galen A Bradley on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company d/b/a State Farm (Bradley, Galen)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4145774.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D10-2001-CT-000087, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company d/b/a State Farm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, Galen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Augustine v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Augustine
Represented By: Donald W Wruck, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company d/b/a State Farm
Represented By: Galen A Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Galen A Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?