Arroyo et al v. Menard, Inc
Plaintiff: Molly Arroyo and Matthew Arroyo
Defendant: Menard Inc dba Menards and Menard, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00065
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by atty Jeff Shaw. Dft appeared by atty Jessica Hamilton. Court addresses current national health crisis (COVID-19) and the potential need to extend previously submitted deadlines. Parties are agreeable to adopting the deadlines with the understanding that the Court would likely find good cause to extend the deadlines should the need arise. The Report filed as DE #15 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/14/2020. Fact discovery to be completed by 5/14/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 2/14/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 3/14/2021. Rebuttal expert reports due by 5/14/2021. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltfs is 7/14/2020; for Dft is 7/28/2020. All discovery to be completed by 5/14/2021. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 3 day jury trial September 2021. Mediator Selection Deadline is 9/14/2020. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 4/9/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (Recorded via ATT Host - Kolar.) (tc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT by Menard, Inc of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Hamilton, Jessica)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Court GRANTS #13 Motion for Leave to Attend Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Telephonically. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 9:30 AM will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Kolar's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/11/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Request to Attend Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Telephonically by Defendant Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Jessica)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/24/2020. (tc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/3/2020 (tc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann recused. Case randomly reassigned to Senior Judge James T Moody for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/20/20. (jat)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative and Other Defenses, and Request for Jury Trial by Menard, Inc.(Hamilton, Jessica)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/18/2020. (tc)
February 13, 2020 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Menard Inc dba Menards of Filing in State Court (Hamilton, Jessica)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menard Inc dba Menards identifying Corporate Parent Menard Inc dba Menards for Menard Inc dba Menards.. (Hamilton, Jessica)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Menard Inc dba Menards. (Hamilton, Jessica)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie B Pollie on behalf of Menard Inc dba Menards (Pollie, Leslie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N Hamilton on behalf of Menard Inc dba Menards (Hamilton, Jessica)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4146105.), filed by Menard Inc dba Menards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Docket; Appearance by Shaw for Plaintiffs; Complaint for Damages; Summons to Menards; Appearance by Pollie and Hamilton for Menards; Menards Motion for Extension to Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; Order Granting Menards Motion for Extension to Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamilton, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arroyo et al v. Menard, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Arroyo
Represented By: Jeff J Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Arroyo
Represented By: Jeff J Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard Inc dba Menards
Represented By: Leslie B Pollie
Represented By: Jessica N Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc
Represented By: Leslie B Pollie
Represented By: Jessica N Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?