Haizlip et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Haizlip and William C. Haizlip
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00091
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-03306. Original file and docket sheet received.
March 3, 2020 Filing 31 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6857) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (6972) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (7113) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 30 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6796) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6966) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7093) - Defs' Reply to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Felix.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 29 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 28 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2054) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2054) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2057) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2243) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2914) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6788) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6948) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Response to Pls' Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7127) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Gregory Bales.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 27 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 26 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 25 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 24 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #23 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 23 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 3/4/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Barbara Haizlip and William C. Haizlip (Balefsky, Lee)(Modified to add party filer)(slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Barbara Haizlip, William C. Haizlip in opposition to #14 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 OPPOSITION by Barbara Haizlip, William C. Haizlip to #14 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #14 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Higginbotham, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A - D)(Higginbotham, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family: William Haizlip; Michael Sims; Tammy Hillgoth; Jacqueline Lawvaugh on a Date to Be Determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Ethicon Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Barbara Haizlip on 5/25/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (PMA) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Howard Diamond on 4/3/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Barbara Haizlip, William C. Haizlip. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
April 24, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 167 (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER)entered on 02/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]
March 18, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3773934. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jk) (Modified on 3/27/2015 to add docket text.) (klc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haizlip et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Haizlip
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Haizlip
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M Gage PHV
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J Combs PHV
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M Gage PHV
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?