Camery v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Paul B. Camery
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00218
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Paul B Camery. Commissioner of Social Security served on 06/29/2020. US Attorney General served on 06/29/2020. US Attorney served on 07/01/2020. Answer due 8/31/2020. (jat)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (bas)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and WAIVING the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/8/2020. (cc: USMS) (bas)
June 4, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon added. (NEW CASE) (IFP PENDING) (mrm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Marcus on behalf of Paul B. Camery (Marcus, Meredith)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Paul B. Camery (Daley, Frederick)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul B. Camery. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms (combined))(Daley, Frederick)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Paul B. Camery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camery v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B. Camery
Represented By: Meredith Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?