Larson et al v. Davidson Trucking Inc et al
Plaintiff: Terry Larson and Jayne Larson
Defendant: Davidson Trucking Inc and Gary Eidt
Not Classified By Court: Pete Schroeder
Case Number: 2:2020cv00250
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/20/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by atty Bryan Bradley. Dfts appeared by atty Robert Foos. The Report filed as DE #12 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/22/2020. All discovery to be completed by 9/15/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/19/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/19/2021. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 5/21/2021. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltfs is 1/29/2021; for Dfts is 2/19/2021. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 5 day jury trial by October 15, 2021. Pete Schroeder appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 9/10/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (Tape #ATT Host - Kolar.) (tc)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bradley, Bryan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Davidson Trucking Inc, Gary Eidt.(Foos, Robert)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2020 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/9/2020. (tc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davidson Trucking Inc. (Foos, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L Bradley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bradley, Bryan)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/8/2020. (tc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Davidson Trucking Inc, Gary Eidt ; answer due by August 3, 2020. (Foos, Robert)
July 7, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Davidson Trucking Inc, Gary Eidt. (Foos, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R Foos, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Foos, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4272854.) from Porter County Superior Court, Cause No. 64D05-2006-CT-004057, filed by Gary Eidt, Davidson Trucking Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record (Plaintiffs Complaint, Appearance, and Summons))(Foos, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson et al v. Davidson Trucking Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Trucking Inc
Represented By: Robert R Foos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Eidt
Represented By: Robert R Foos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Larson
Represented By: Bryan L Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayne Larson
Represented By: Bryan L Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Pete Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?