Beardson v. Franciscan Alliance INC
Plaintiff: Alva E Beardson
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance Inc and Franciscan Alliance Inc doing business as Franciscan Health
Case Number: 2:2020cv00269
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/4/2020. (tc)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: For good cause shown and without objection, the Court GRANTS #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File its Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant is allowed until 9/25/2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/4/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed Motion) by Defendant Franciscan Alliance Inc. (Jaremus, Christina)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Jaremus on behalf of Franciscan Alliance Inc (Jaremus, Christina)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Franciscan Alliance Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
July 17, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Franciscan Alliance Inc( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4284581.), filed by Alva E Beardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC CHARGE, #2 Exhibit B - NOTICE OF RIGHT TO SUE, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(McEuen, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beardson v. Franciscan Alliance INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance Inc doing business as Franciscan Health
Represented By: Christina Jaremus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alva E Beardson
Represented By: Patrick B McEuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?