Singh v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Jasmail Singh
Defendant: John Doe and ANG Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00307
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: ANG Transportation, Inc., John Doe, Jasmail Singh was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #8 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. ANG Transportation, Inc., John Doe, Jasmail Singh shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone. (tlr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Ryan Etter. Dfts appeared by atty Thomas Vetne. The Report filed as DE #9 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/23/2020. All discovery to be completed by 8/27/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 2/26/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/30/2021. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 5/28/2021. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltf is 1/29/2021; for Dfts is 2/26/2021. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 3 day trial by November 2021. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/15/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (Tape #ATT HOST - Kolar.) (tc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vetne, J)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2020 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/2/2020. (tc)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/24/2020. (tc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ANG Transportation, Inc., John Doe.(Vetne, J)
August 20, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANG Transportation, Inc.. (Vetne, J)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J Thomas Vetne on behalf of All Defendants (Vetne, J)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4317018.) from Porter Superior Court, Cause No. 64D05-2008-CT-006083, filed by ANG Transportation, Inc., John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit a, #3 Exhibit b)(Vetne, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANG Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmail Singh
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Etter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?