Walton v. Bowden et al
Plaintiff: Tracy L Walton
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Rickie L Bowden and Rickey L Bowden
Not Classified By Court: Richard McDevitt
Case Number: 2:2020cv00350
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE: Counsel for Rickey L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #11 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Rickey L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone (shk)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: The Court STRIKES #14 Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 26-2, parties must not file service of discovery notices. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/19/2020. Text entry only. (tc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 STRICKEN RE 15 MINUTE ORDER: NOTICE by Rickey L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Owen, Bradley) Modified on 11/19/2020 (tc).
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/30/2020, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Julie Dugan. Dft appeared by atty Bradley Owen. The Report filed as DE #12 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/20/2020. The last date to complete all discovery is 7/23/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/26/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/26/2021. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 6/25/2021. The last date for any party to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 12/31/2020. Richard McDevitt appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/20/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (tc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Owen, Bradley)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2020 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Rodovich's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/14/2020. (tc)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/1/2020. (tc)
September 30, 2020 Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (jat)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and Jury Demand to #7 State Court Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Rickey L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (jat)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc... (Gaston, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce D Jones on behalf of Rickie L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Jones, Bruce)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel O Webster on behalf of Rickie L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Webster, Rachel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M Owen on behalf of Rickie L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Owen, Bradley)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A Gaston on behalf of Rickie L Bowden, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Gaston, Keith)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4356367.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D04-2007-CT-000781, filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Rickie L Bowden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Appearance, Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand, Summons, Notice of Service of Complaint and Summons to Defendant, Alias Summons, Appearance, Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, Notice of Service of Complaint and Summons to Defendant), #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Amount in Controversy, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaston, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Bowden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L Walton
Represented By: Julie A Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel O Webster
Represented By: Bruce D Jones
Represented By: Keith A Gaston
Represented By: Bradley M Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickie L Bowden
Represented By: Rachel O Webster
Represented By: Bruce D Jones
Represented By: Keith A Gaston
Represented By: Bradley M Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey L Bowden
Represented By: Rachel O Webster
Represented By: Bruce D Jones
Represented By: Keith A Gaston
Represented By: Bradley M Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?