The Huntington National Bank v. Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Defendant: Neil A. Rago, Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC, f/k/a Rago & Snyder CPA and Associates LLC, Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC and Rago & Snyder CPA and Associates LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00366
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank. Neil A. Rago served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Eres PHV, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank. Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Eres PHV, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement regarding #10 Opinion and Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Eres PHV, Andrew)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 11/2/2020, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of Defendant Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC, f/k/a Rago & Snyder CPA and Associates LLC as stated above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/19/2020. (bas)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew H Eres PHV for The Huntington National Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/15/2020. (ace)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Andrew H Eres to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Huntington National Bank. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4370616(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC, Neil A. Rago. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Delehanty, Joseph)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Delehanty, Joseph)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 No Summons received. (Email sent to Attorney Joseph R Delehanty)(mrm)
October 14, 2020 Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. *NEW CASE* (mrm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Huntington National Bank identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Bancshares Incorporated for The Huntington National Bank.. (Delehanty, Joseph)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R Delehanty on behalf of The Huntington National Bank (Delehanty, Joseph)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC, f/k/a Rago & Snyder CPA and Associates LLC, Neil A. Rago( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4368912.), filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit)(Delehanty, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Huntington National Bank v. Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Joseph R Delehanty
Represented By: Andrew H Eres PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil A. Rago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC, f/k/a Rago & Snyder CPA and Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rago & Snyder CPA and Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?