Edwards v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Phillip Edwards
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00448
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Gardner, Samuel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 23 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/29/2021. (tc)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amy C Moorkamp PHV for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/29/2021. (ace)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Clark W Hedger PHV for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/29/2021. (ace)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edward S Bott PHV, Jr for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/29/2021. (ace)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 Application for Attorney Amy C. Moorkamp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4467989(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 Application for Attorney Clark W. Hedger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4467983(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 Application for Attorney Edward S. Bott Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4467973(Bott PHV, Edward)
January 15, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Gardner, Samuel)
January 13, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, filed by Phillip Edwards.(Sarkisian, Arman)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: For good cause shown and without objection, the Court GRANTS #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages. Plaintiff shall promptly file a stand-alone copy of his First Amended Complaint [12-1], and Defendant shall file its response to the First Amended Complaint by 2/2/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/13/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint CORRECTED by Plaintiff Phillip Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sarkisian, Arman)
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 **PLEASE DISREGARD - Incorrect document attached, refiled at DE #12 ** MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Phillip Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sarkisian, Arman) Modified on 1/12/2021 to disregard (mrm).
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Smikle on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Smikle, Richard)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/25/2021. (tc)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/4/2021. (tc)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Gardner, Samuel)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Gardner, Samuel)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B Gardner on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Gardner, Samuel)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of Plaintiff, by counsel, Supplementing Jurisdictional Allegations in Complaint filed by Phillip Edwards. (Sarkisian, Arman)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 12/23/2020, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges his citizenship as stated above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/9/2020. (bas) Modified on 12/11/2020 to correct file date (mlc).
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
December 7, 2020 Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4417959.), filed by Phillip Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Defendant)(Sarkisian, Arman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Edwards
Represented By: Arman Garo Sarkisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Samuel B Gardner
Represented By: Edward S Bott PHV, Jr
Represented By: Richard A Smikle
Represented By: Amy C Moorkamp PHV
Represented By: Clark W Hedger PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?