Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC v. SEI Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC and Arcelormittal Burns Harbor LLC
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company and SEI Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00062
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: For good cause shown and without objection, the Court GRANTS #22 Defendant SEI Solution's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant is allowed until 5/12/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/9/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Defendant SEI Solutions LLC. (Mulroony, Amanda)
April 8, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEI Solutions LLC. (Mulroony, Amanda)
April 8, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L B Mulroony on behalf of SEI Solutions LLC (Mulroony, Amanda)
April 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Limrick on behalf of SEI Solutions LLC (Limrick, Michael)
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David K Herzog on behalf of SEI Solutions LLC (Herzog, David)
April 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Evanston Insurance Company answer due 5/6/21 per #16 Agreed Notice (jld)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W Jochum on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company (Jochum, Jason)
April 7, 2021 Filing 16 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Evanston Insurance Company ; answer due by May 6, 2021. (Cockrum, Scott)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B Cockrum on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company (Cockrum, Scott)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 STATEMENT (Second Jurisdictional) regarding #6 Order, Set Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State of Virginia's Information on Markel Insurance Company)(Renfro, T)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Evanston Insurance Company. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Corrected summons issued to Defendant, Evanston Insurance Company, previously issued as DE #12 . (shk)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Evanston Insurance Company. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/11/2021. (tc)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: For good cause shown and without objection, the Court GRANTS #8 Defendant SEI Solutions, LLC's Motion for Additional Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant is allowed until 4/12/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/10/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC. (Renfro, T) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2021: #1 Corrected Alias Summons) (shk).
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant SEI Solutions LLC. (Tilden, Nicholas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Tilden on behalf of SEI Solutions LLC (Tilden, Nicholas)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before March 19, 2021, a second Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that provides the information stated in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/5/21. (mlc)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT on Jurisdiction regarding #4 Opinion and Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Renfro, T)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 3/8/2021, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the amount in controversy and citizenship of both Defendants as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/22/2021. (mrm)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Evanston Insurance Company, SEI Solutions LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
February 18, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by T Allon Renfro, Jr on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC (Renfro, T)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evanston Insurance Company, SEI Solutions LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4487923.), filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AMUSA-113, #2 Exhibit 2 - Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Contract Safety Handbook, #4 Exhibit 4- Evanston Insurance Policy, #5 Exhibit 5 - Underlying Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Tender Letters, #7 Exhibit 7 - Tender Denials, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to Evanston Insurance Company, #10 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to SEI Solutions)(Renfro, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC v. SEI Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason W Jochum
Represented By: Scott B Cockrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Solutions LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A Tilden
Represented By: Amanda L B Mulroony
Represented By: David K Herzog
Represented By: Michael R Limrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC
Represented By: T Allon Renfro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arcelormittal Burns Harbor LLC
Represented By: T Allon Renfro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?