Fund Recovery Services, LLC v. Wolfe et al
Plaintiff: Fund Recovery Services, LLC
Defendant: Raviv Wolfe and Katherine Wolfe
Case Number: 2:2021cv00093
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Katherine Wolfe answer due 4/30/2021 per DE #10 Affidavit (nae)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Katherine Wolfe on April 9, 2021, filed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC. (Deutmeyer, Ryan)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Response re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Raviv Wolfe. Raviv Wolfe answer due 5/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/14/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Response re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Raviv Wolfe. (shk)
April 9, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Raviv Wolfe answer due 4/9/2021. (mlc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Raviv Wolfe on March 19, 2021, filed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC. (Deutmeyer, Ryan)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey E Crane PHV for Fund Recovery Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/19/2021. (ace)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Application for Attorney Jeffrey E Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fund Recovery Services, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4516146(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Raviv Wolfe, Katherine Wolfe. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
March 16, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nae)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Jasaitis on behalf of Fund Recovery Services, LLC (Jasaitis, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Andrew Deutmeyer on behalf of Fund Recovery Services, LLC (Deutmeyer, Ryan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katherine Wolfe, Raviv Wolfe( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4512534.), filed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Deutmeyer, Ryan) Modified on 3/15/2021 (shk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fund Recovery Services, LLC v. Wolfe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fund Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Jasaitis
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Deutmeyer
Represented By: Jeffrey E Crane PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raviv Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?