McInnis v. Veterans Village
Plaintiff: Gregory McInnis
Defendant: Veterans Village
Case Number: 2:2021cv00127
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Order. (lhc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing of civil cover sheet by Gregory McInnis (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(edb)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff until 6/14/2021, to file a complaint and complete and return the appropriate number of summons and USM-285 forms; and CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to respond by the above deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party, 1st class and cert mail 7019 2970 0000 0354 7701) (lhc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gregory McInnis. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope)(shk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McInnis v. Veterans Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?