United States of America v. Bissonnette et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nicole Bissonnette as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Sanders, Nicole Bissonnette and Richard D Trainor
Case Number: 2:2021cv00134
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint and Defenses by Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of ).(Woods, Judy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of ), Nicole Bissonnette(individually, and in her capacity as the guardian of I.M.S. and L.G.S), filed by United States of America.(Kaufman, Joseph)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 STIPULATION regarding Defendant Richard D. Trainor filed by United States of America and ORDERING Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint removing Richard D. Trainor as a party defendant by 6/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/1/2021. (lhc)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION regarding Defendant Richard D. Trainor by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kaufman, Joseph)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/26/2021. (smb)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Richard D Trainor waiver sent on 4/21/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Kaufman, Joseph)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER by Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of ), Nicole Bissonnette(individually, and in her capacity as the guardian of I.M.S. and L.G.S) Personal Representative. (Woods, Judy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER by Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of ), Nicole Bissonnette(individually, and in her capacity as the guardian of I.M.S. and L.G.S) Guardian. (Woods, Judy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER by Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of ), Nicole Bissonnette(individually, and in her capacity as the guardian of I.M.S. and L.G.S) Individually. (Woods, Judy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy L Woods on behalf of Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of ), Nicole Bissonnette(individually, and in her capacity as the guardian of I.M.S. and L.G.S) (Woods, Judy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nicole Bissonnette(as Personal Representative of the estate of Gary Sanders ), Nicole Bissonnette(individually, and in her capacity capacity as the guardian of I.M.S. and L.G.S), Richard D Trainor. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
April 22, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Nicole Bissonnette, #3 Proposed Summons to Nicole Bissonnette as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Sanders, #4 Proposed Summons to Richard D. Trainor)(Kaufman, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bissonnette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bissonnette as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bissonnette
Represented By: Judy L Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph M Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?