Skertich et al v. RGS Financial et al
Plaintiff: Robert Skertich and Mariya Skertich
Defendant: RGS Financial and TCF National Bank
Case Number: 2:2021cv00149
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE: Mariya Skertich, Robert Skertich was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #14 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Mariya Skertich, Robert Skertich shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. **Copy of Consent re-sent to Plaintiff. (shk)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: At Defendants' request #15 , the Motion to Seal the Confidential Settlement Agreement #9 is hereby WITHDRAWN. The Court DIRECTS the clerk to docket the unsealed agreement 15-1 as an exhibit to the Motion to Dismiss, replacing the "Placeholder" exhibit 11-1. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/7/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by RGS Financial, TCF National Bank re #9 MOTION to Seal (withdrawal of motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Watts, Patrick)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (tc)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/7/2021. (tc)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court hereby TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT Defendants RGS Financial, Inc. and TCF National Banks Motion to Seal Document Used in Support of Their Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Dismiss with Prejudice #9 . The Court SETS a deadline of 6/7/2021 by which Defendants may file a statement explaining why, in light of the cases cited above, the settlement agreement may be filed under seal. In the absence of such a statement, or if such statement is insufficient, the Court will unseal the settlement agreement filed at Docket Entry 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/5/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(rmf)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #8 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. The appearance of Reynold T. Berry on behalf of Defendants RGS Financial and TCF National Bank is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/5/2021. Text entry order. cc: Pro se Pltfs (tc)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement and Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendants RGS Financial, TCF National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Placeholder, #2 Exhibit B- RGS Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - TCF Declaration, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Watts, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #5 Exhibit A) (tc).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Sealed Document re #9 MOTION to Seal . (Watts, Patrick)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Seal by Defendants RGS Financial, TCF National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Watts, Patrick)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants RGS Financial, TCF National Bank. (Berry, Reynold)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/3/2021. cc: Pro se pltfs (tc)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TCF National Bank identifying Corporate Parent TCF Financial Corp for TCF National Bank.. (Watts, Patrick)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RGS Financial. (Watts, Patrick)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A Watts on behalf of RGS Financial, TCF National Bank (Watts, Patrick)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Reynold T Berry on behalf of All Defendants (Berry, Reynold)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4558256.), filed by RGS Financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Reynold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skertich et al v. RGS Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGS Financial
Represented By: Reynold T Berry
Represented By: Patrick A Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF National Bank
Represented By: Reynold T Berry
Represented By: Patrick A Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Skertich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariya Skertich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?