Matthews v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Amy M. Matthews
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00193
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Amy M. Matthews. US Attorney served on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (nal)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/16/2021. (tc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(bas)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/16/2021. (cc: USMS)(bas)
June 11, 2021 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (nal)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Marcus on behalf of Amy M. Matthews (Marcus, Meredith)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Amy M. Matthews (Daley, Frederick)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Amy M. Matthews. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms (combined))(Daley, Frederick)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Amy M. Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy M. Matthews
Represented By: Meredith Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?