Steele v. Rich et al
Plaintiff: Valorie Steele
Defendant: Alfred J Rich, Koleasco, Inc., Alfred J. Rich and Koleaseco, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00203
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2021 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/10/2021. (smb)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/27/2021. (smb)
June 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Koleasco, Inc. and Alfred J Rich; answers due by 7/23/2021, per #5 . (lhc)
June 28, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (shk)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Koleasco, Inc., Alfred J Rich ; answer due by July 23, 2021. (Foos, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Koleasco, Inc., Alfred J Rich. (Foos, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koleasco, Inc.. (Foos, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R Foos, Jr on behalf of Koleasco, Inc., Alfred J Rich (Foos, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4612092.) from Porter Superior Court, Cause No. 64D01-2102-CT-001190, filed by Koleasco, Inc., Alfred J Rich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record)(Foos, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Rich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred J Rich
Represented By: Robert R Foos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koleasco, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R Foos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred J. Rich
Represented By: Robert R Foos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koleaseco, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R Foos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valorie Steele
Represented By: Katherine S Sarkisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?