Isom v. Neal et al
Petitioner: Kevin Isom
Respondent: Ron Neal and Indiana State Prison
Not Classified By Court: Shawn Nolan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00231
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A Kobe on behalf of Ron Neal (Kobe, Andrew)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A Kobe on behalf of Ron Neal (Kobe, Andrew) ****FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #5 *** Modified on 9/9/2021 (ace).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Nolan - FCD on behalf of Kevin Isom (Nolan - FCD, Shawn)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Miscellaneous Party Shawn Nolan. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 7/27/2021. (lhc) (copy mailed to Kevin Isom) Modified on 7/28/2021 to add routing (lns).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Miscellaneous Party Shawn Nolan. (tlr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isom v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Isom
Represented By: Shawn Nolan - FCD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Neal
Represented By: Andrew A Kobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Indiana State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shawn Nolan
Represented By: Shawn Nolan - FCD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?