Smith v. State of Doe et al
Defendant: State of Doe, John Galipeau, Larry Crittendon, Craig Johnson and State of Indiana
Estate Plaintiff: Bobby Jean Smith and Richard Canada
Case Number: 2:2021cv00257
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to State of Indiana. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Indiana, filed by Richard Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Gladish, David)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued, Acknowledgement filed by Richard Canada. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope)(Gladish, David)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Larry Crittendon, John Galipeau, Craig Johnson. *No Summons received for State of Doe* NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mrm)
August 19, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Gladish on behalf of Bobby Jean Smith (Attachments: #1 Appearance)(Gladish, David)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4661972.), filed by Bobby Jean Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Gladish, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State of Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Bobby Jean Smith
Represented By: David S Gladish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Richard Canada
Represented By: David S Gladish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Galipeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crittendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?