Williamson v. Methodist Hospital, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Armanette A Williamson and Armanette Williamson
Defendant: Methodist Hospital, ERIN JANSKY, JAIME SERRANO, denise vasquez, PENNY HOLSCLAW, Rosemary Muex, Methodist Hospitals, Inc and Unknown Supervisors & Employees of Methodist
Case Number: 2:2021cv00277
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rosemary Muex, Denise Vasquez. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #12 Motion for Enlargement of Time. The deadline for Defendants Erin Jansky, Methodist Hospitals, Inc., Jaime Serrano to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 11/30/2021. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/3/2021. Text entry only. (tc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Summons filed by Armanette Williamson. (Remley, Robin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Summons filed by Armanette Williamson. (Remley, Robin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint by Defendants Erin Jansky, Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Jaime Serrano. (Scott, Steven)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Erin Jansky, Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Rosemary Muex, Jaime Serrano, Unknown Supervisors & Employees of Methodist, Denise Vasquez, filed by Armanette Williamson.(Remley, Robin) Modified on 10/27/2021 (bas).
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 *DISREGARD - REDOCKETED AT DE #11 * AMENDED COMPLAINT against Erin Jansky, Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Rosemary Muex, Jaime Serrano, Unknown Supervisors & Employees of Methodist, Denise Vasquez, filed by Armanette Williamson.(Remley, Robin) Modified on 10/27/2021 (bas).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/13/2021. (tc)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #7 Motion for Enlargement of Time. The deadline for Defendants Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Erin Jansky, Jaime Serrano to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to 11/5/2021. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/8/2021. Text entry only. (tc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Erin Jansky, Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Jaime Serrano. (Scott, Steven)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Scott on behalf of Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Erin Jansky, Jaime Serrano (Scott, Steven) Modified on 10/8/2021 (shk).
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Armanette Williamson as to Penny Holsclaw; Erin Jansky; Methodist Hospitals, Inc; Rosemary Muex; Jaime Serrano; and Denise Vasquez. All parties served on 9/18/2021 with all answers due 10/12/2021. (lhc)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Penny Holsclaw, Erin Jansky, Methodist Hospitals, Inc, Rosemary Muex, Jaime Serrano, Denise Vasquez, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(bas)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case; and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendants. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 9/9/2021. (cc: USMS) (bas) Modified on 9/9/2021 (bas).
September 7, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE; IFP MOTION PENDING) (bas)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Armanette A Williamson. (Remley, Robin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants, filed by Armanette A Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Remley, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Methodist Hospital, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armanette A Williamson
Represented By: Robin G Remley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armanette Williamson
Represented By: Robin G Remley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methodist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN JANSKY
Represented By: Steven J Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIME SERRANO
Represented By: Steven J Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: denise vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY HOLSCLAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Muex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methodist Hospitals, Inc
Represented By: Steven J Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Supervisors & Employees of Methodist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?