Johnson v. Hodges & Davis PC
Plaintiff: Krystal D. Johnson
Defendant: Hodges & Davis PC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00300
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Based on the Court's understanding that all claims are being resolved, Johnson's counsel shall file, no later than 1/21/2022, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a motion for the entry of a consent judgment. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/22/2021. (mrm)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Krystal D. Johnson (Daher, Marwan)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal D. Johnson. Hodges & Davis PC served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (Daher, Marwan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hodges & Davis PC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nhc)
September 28, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (nhc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor T Metroff on behalf of Krystal D Johnson (Metroff, Victor)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A McLaughlin on behalf of Krystal D Johnson (McLaughlin, Jennifer)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammed O Badwan on behalf of Krystal D Johnson (Badwan, Mohammed)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar T Sulaiman on behalf of Krystal D Johnson (Sulaiman, Omar)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marwan R Daher on behalf of Krystal D Johnson (Daher, Marwan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hodges & Davis PC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4698657.), filed by Krystal D Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Daher, Marwan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hodges & Davis PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal D. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer A McLaughlin
Represented By: Mohammed O Badwan
Represented By: Omar T Sulaiman
Represented By: Victor T Metroff
Represented By: Marwan R Daher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hodges & Davis PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?