Schwarten-Anderson et al v. Valparaiso Community Schools et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Schwarten-Anderson and L. A.
Defendant: Valparaiso Community Schools and Porter County Education Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv00304
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Cases associated. (mlc)
November 12, 2021 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (mlc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: In Person Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 9:00 a.m. (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. At least 5 days in advance of the conference, each party shall provide the court with a brief Confidential Settlement Memorandum in pdf format to Kolar_Chambers@innd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/10/2021. (tc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 19 SCHEDULED AS A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (held in conjunction w/2:21cv301) on 11/10/2021, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Catherine Michael, Sonja Kerr. Dfts appeared by attys Monica Conrad, Sara Blevins. The Court advises parties of intention to grant DE 13 in 2:21cv301, Motion to Consolidate Cases. By agreement, In Person Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2021 09:00 AM (Central time) in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Written order to follow. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/1/2021. (Tape #FTR GOLD (5).) (tc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE/RESPONSE to Notice to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs L. A., Victoria Schwarten-Anderson. (Kerr, Sonja). Modified on 11/4/2021 to correctly identify name of document. (cer)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blevins, Sara)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2021 11:15 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/29/2021. (tc)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Porter County Education Services, Valparaiso Community Schools of Motion to Consolidate Cases filed in Case No. 2:21-cv-00301-HAB-JPK (Blevins, Sara)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Porter County Education Services, Valparaiso Community Schools.(Blevins, Sara)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica J Conrad on behalf of All Defendants (Conrad, Monica)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R Blevins on behalf of All Defendants (Blevins, Sara)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Schwarten-Anderson, L. A.. Valparaiso Community Schools served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kerr, Sonja)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Schwarten-Anderson, L. A.. Porter County Education Services served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kerr, Sonja)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M Michael on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michael, Catherine)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(e) the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to Judge Holly A. Brady. The case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Joshua P. Kolar. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann 10/4/2021. (mrm)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Judge Philip P. Simon recuses himself from this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 and the Clerk shall reassign the matter to another district judge. Case reassigned to Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 9/30/2021. (bas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Porter County Education Services, Valparaiso Community Schools. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by L. A., Victoria Schwarten-Anderson. (Kerr, Sonja)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by L. A., Victoria Schwarten-Anderson. (Kerr, Sonja)
September 29, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (jdb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonja D Kerr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kerr, Sonja)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4700741.), filed by Victoria Schwarten-Anderson, L. A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Hearing Decision)(Kerr, Sonja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwarten-Anderson et al v. Valparaiso Community Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Schwarten-Anderson
Represented By: Sonja D Kerr
Represented By: Catherine M Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. A.
Represented By: Sonja D Kerr
Represented By: Catherine M Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valparaiso Community Schools
Represented By: Monica J Conrad
Represented By: Sara R Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter County Education Services
Represented By: Monica J Conrad
Represented By: Sara R Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?