Bowes-Northern v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Shedrick Bowes-Northern
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, Corie Barry, Andrew Bonnell and Best Buy Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00329
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/1/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset answer deadline for all defendants to 12/30/2021 per DE #14 . (bas)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Bonnell, Corie Barry, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, Best Buy Co Inc. Answer due 12/30/2021. (Mervilde, John) Modified on 11/24/2021 (bas).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A Davis on behalf of All Defendants (Davis, Neil)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Mervilde on behalf of All Defendants (Mervilde, John)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Best Buy Co, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc, Corie Barry, Andrew Bonnell. (Copy mailed to Dfts as directed in Order) Waiver of Service due by 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (lhc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2021: #3 Amended Complaint) (lhc).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff's Request to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee #5 and DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case; DIRECTS the clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and if necessary the United States Marshals Service to serve process on) the defendants at the mailing addresses provided on the proposed summonses [DE #1 -4], with a copy of this order and the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE plaintiff's Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel #6 . Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/1/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02617. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (mlc)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana at Hammond. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana at Hammond, on October 18, 2021. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.]
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLOSED TRANSFER to THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA, HAMMOND DIVISION. "For the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought." Based on the foregoing, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, at Hammond. The pending motions in this case remain pending for disposition by the Northern District of Indiana. The clerk is DIRECTED TO TERMINATE the pending motions on this docket. (See Order). Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/18/2021. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.]
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.] Modified on 10/21/2021 to unterm motion (mlc).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.] Modified on 10/21/2021 to unterm motion (mlc).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.]
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CORIE BARRY, BEST BUY CO. INC, ANDREW BONNELL, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC., filed by SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(MAC) Modified on 10/18/2021 (MAC). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.]
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORIE BARRY, BEST BUY CO. INC, ANDREW BONNELL, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.,, filed by SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Best Buy Human Rights Corporate Statement, #2 Exhibit Best Buy Statement Opposing Discrimination, #3 Exhibit Southlake ED After Visit Summary, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 USM 285 Form)(LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowes-Northern v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedrick Bowes-Northern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Represented By: John W Mervilde
Represented By: Neil A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corie Barry
Represented By: John W Mervilde
Represented By: Neil A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bonnell
Represented By: John W Mervilde
Represented By: Neil A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co Inc
Represented By: John W Mervilde
Represented By: Neil A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?