Gardner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary F. Gardner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00333
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William C Lee for all further proceedings. Judge Philip P Simon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 12/21/2021. (lns)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/29/2021. (smb)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Mary F. Gardner. Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney served on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (mrm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/28/2021. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
October 27, 2021 **NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nhc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Marcus on behalf of Mary F. Gardner (Marcus, Meredith)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Mary F. Gardner (Daley, Frederick)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mary F. Gardner. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms (combined))(Daley, Frederick)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary F. Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary F. Gardner
Represented By: Meredith Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?