Eriksen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah K. Eriksen
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00335
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/28/2021. (smb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah K. Eriksen. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/3/2021; U.S. Attorney General served on 12/2/2021; and U.S. Attorney served on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (bas)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc:USMS) (jdb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the filing fee is WAIVED. The United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/03/2021. (cc:USMS) (jdb)
October 29, 2021 **NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nhc)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Lavella on behalf of Deborah K. Eriksen (Lavella, Nicholas)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy E Burns on behalf of Deborah K. Eriksen (Burns, Timothy)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of Deborah K. Eriksen (Richter, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Deborah K. Eriksen. (Richter, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Deborah K. Eriksen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney N.D. IND, #4 Proposed Summons SSA OGC, #5 USM 285- U.S. Attorney General, #6 USM 285- U.S. Attorney N.D. IND, #7 USM 285- SSA OGC)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eriksen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah K. Eriksen
Represented By: Nicholas T Lavella
Represented By: Timothy E Burns
Represented By: Matthew F Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?