Hamilton v. C T Corporation
Plaintiff: Sandra Hamilton and Sandra L. Hamilton
Defendant: Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC and C T Corporation doing business as Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00336
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 ***Jurisdictional Statement Deadline terminated. (kms)
December 8, 2021 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT Jurisdictional Statement filed by C T Corporation. (Hearn, Edward) Modified on 12/8/2021 (jdb).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The court ORDERS Defendant CT Corporation d/b/a Ameristar Casino East Chicago, LLC to FILE on or before 12/22/2021 a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges its citizenship as stated above. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/8/2021. (bas)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court, finding good cause and noting the lack of objection, GRANTS #13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Discovery and other proceedings unrelated to #11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings are STAYED until the court enters a ruling on #11 . The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 is VACATED. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/6/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
December 6, 2021 ***Hearing terminated. (tc)
December 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/27/2021. (tc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay proceedings by Defendant C T Corporation. (Hearn, Edward)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by C T Corporation. (Hearn, Edward)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant C T Corporation. (Hearn, Edward)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by C T Corporation.(Hearn, Edward)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 09:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/22/2021. (tc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). State Court Case No. 45D01-2109-CT-000947. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/2/2021. (tc)
November 1, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nhc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A Breitweiser-Hurst on behalf of Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC (Breitweiser-Hurst, Catherine)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W Hearn on behalf of Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC (Hearn, Edward)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc., Corporate Parent Pinnacle MLS, LLC, Corporate Parent Penn National Gaming, Inc., Other Affiliate Ameristar Casino East Chicago Holdings llc for Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC.. (Hearn, Edward)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4731485.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2109-CT-000947, filed by Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Complaint, #3 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit Response from Plaintiff)(Hearn, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. C T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael P McCready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC
Represented By: Catherine A Breitweiser-Hurst
Represented By: Edward W Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C T Corporation doing business as Ameristar Casino East Chicago LLC
Represented By: Catherine A Breitweiser-Hurst
Represented By: Edward W Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?