Community Hospital v. Becerra
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Defendant: Secretary Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 2:2022cv00028
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Set Deadlines per #8 Xavier Becerra answer due by 5/19/22. (nal)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/22/2022. (smb)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Xavier Becerra ; answer due by May 19, 2022. (Irvin AUSA, Brian)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Irvin AUSA on behalf of Xavier Becerra (Irvin AUSA, Brian)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Hospital. Xavier Becerra served on 2/24/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service on US Attorney General, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service US Dept of Health and Human Services, #3 Exhibit C-Proof of Service US Attorney)(Kerridge, Jeanine)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Northern District of Indiana Local Rule 40-1(f)(1), the court finds that the speedy administration of justice requires that this case be reassigned. Accordingly, the undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from this matter and DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign this case to another district judge in accordance with the Local Rules. Senior Judge James T Moody recused. Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 3/2/2022. (rmf)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (nal)
February 15, 2022 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (nal)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J Michael Grubbs on behalf of COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Grubbs, J)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine Kerridge on behalf of COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Kerridge, Jeanine)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINNDC-4832066) filed by Community Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Kerridge, Jeanine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Hospital v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: J Michael Grubbs
Represented By: Jeanine Kerridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Brian Irvin AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?