Nesmith et al v. Star Freight LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Nesmith, Terry Crosby and Richard Maye
Defendant: Star Freight LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00287
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2022 10:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/2/2022. (tc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/16/2022. (tc)
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Rowlett on behalf of Star Freight LLC (Rowlett, Robert)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Eckhart on behalf of Star Freight LLC (Eckhart, James)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Star Freight LLC. (Eckhart, Christopher)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Star Freight LLC ; answer due by 12/8/2022. (Eckhart, Christopher)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Eckhart on behalf of Star Freight LLC (Eckhart, Christopher)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Nesmith, Richard Maye, Terry Crosby. Star Freight LLC served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (Brown, Emily)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Star Freight LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
October 5, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Emily)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wilmes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilmes, Christopher)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Star Freight LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5040018.), filed by Ronald Nesmith, Richard Maye, Terry Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Wilmes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesmith et al v. Star Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Nesmith
Represented By: Emily Brown
Represented By: Christopher Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Crosby
Represented By: Emily Brown
Represented By: Christopher Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Maye
Represented By: Emily Brown
Represented By: Christopher Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Freight LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Eckhart
Represented By: James A Eckhart
Represented By: Robert A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?