Cocquyt v. Norfolk Southern Corporation
Plaintiff: John Cocquyt and John C Cocquyt
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00320
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 3-1(a) and (b)(2), the Clerk is directed to reopen this case in the South Bend division. Plaintiff John Cocquyt's Motion to Remand for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction #13 remains pending for consideration by the district judge to whom the case is assigned upon transfer, once the motion is fully briefed. 3:22-cv-1022; Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr.; Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/14/2022. (jdb)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING the Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 12/15/2022 and related deadline for parties to file a joint discovery plan until after ruling on the pending motion to remand. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/9/2022. (smb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Loftus, Barry)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response to be filed by 12/12/2022. Reply to be filed by 12/19/2022.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/18/2022. No pdf attached.(cp)
November 17, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Loftus, Barry)
November 11, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John C Cocquyt. (Surrisi, Janette)
November 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff John C Cocquyt. (Surrisi, Janette)
November 10, 2022 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 12/9/2022.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/10/2022. (smb)
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Norfolk Southern Corporation.(Loftus, Barry)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/2022. (smb)
November 2, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (sej)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Janette E Surrisi on behalf of John Cocquyt (Surrisi, Janette)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scotty N Teal on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation (Teal, Scotty)
November 1, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk)(Loftus, Barry)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Loftus, Barry)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry L Loftus on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation (Loftus, Barry)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5065849.) from Marshall Circuit Court, Cause No. 50C01-2210-PL-000033, filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loftus, Barry)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corporation, filed by John C Cocquyt in Marshall Circuit Court 50C01-2210-PL-000033. (sej)
October 17, 2022 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corporation, filed by John C Cocquyt in Marshall Circuit Court 50C01-2210-PL-000033.(sej) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2022: #1 Corrected Main Document) (sej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cocquyt v. Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cocquyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Cocquyt
Represented By: Janette E Surrisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Scotty N Teal
Represented By: Barry L Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?