Hardy v. NiSource Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua Hardy
Defendant: NiSource Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00322
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 16 First MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant NiSource Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kim Thompson)(Black, Bianca)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan Steinhart PHV for Joshua Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/22/2022. (ace)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Dunlap PHV for Joshua Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/2022. (ace)
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 Application for Attorney Ryan W. Steinhart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Hardy. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5111759 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dunlap, Andrew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Andrew Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Hardy. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5092240 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2022: #2 Federal Court Admission Addendum) (ace).
November 23, 2022 Set Answer Deadlines: NiSource Inc. answer due 12/23/2022 re #7 . (nhc)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2023 01:00 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/22/2022. (smb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/22/2022. (smb)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NiSource Inc.. (Black, Bianca)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by NiSource Inc. ; answer due by December 23, 2022. (Black, Bianca)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca V Black on behalf of All Defendants (Black, Bianca)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Hardy. NiSource Inc. served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Werman, Douglas)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NiSource Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Joshua Hardy. (Werman, Douglas)
November 1, 2022 Counsel did not submit Summons or a Notice of Request for Waiver of Service. (sej)
November 1, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (sej)
November 1, 2022 **Case reassigned due to initial assignment error** Judge Philip P Simon added. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. (sej)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Werman on behalf of Joshua Hardy (Werman, Douglas)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against NiSource Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5065471.), filed by Joshua Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werman, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. NiSource Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hardy
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Ryan Steinhart PHV
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NiSource Inc.
Represented By: Bianca V Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?