Lane v. Contrak Courier, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Lane
Defendant: Contrak Courier, Inc. and Dennis Morrow
Case Number: 2:2022cv00337
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2023 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 1/20/2023.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/13/2022. (smb)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/13/2022. (smb)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Codey L Spear on behalf of Contrak Courier, Inc., Dennis Morrow (Spear, Codey)
December 7, 2022 Set Deadlines per #6 Agreed Notice. Defendant Contrak Courier, Inc., Dennis Morrow answer due by 1/3/2023. (mrm)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Contrak Courier, Inc., Dennis Morrow. (Hoffman, James) Modified on 12/7/2022 to update (mrm)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Hoffman on behalf of All Defendants (Hoffman, James) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE.*** Modified on 12/7/2022 (ace).
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Hoffman on behalf of All Defendants (Hoffman, James)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Contrak Courier, Inc., Dennis Morrow. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
November 15, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (mlc)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Wolcott on behalf of Charles Lane (Wolcott, Christopher)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5077269.), filed by Charles Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Wolcott, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Contrak Courier, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lane
Represented By: Christopher S Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contrak Courier, Inc.
Represented By: Codey L Spear
Represented By: James A Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Morrow
Represented By: Codey L Spear
Represented By: James A Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?