Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity v. C.N.B. Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity
Defendant: C.N.B. Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00344
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Filing 8 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.N.B. Construction, LLC. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity. (Diblich, Natalie)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/6/2023. (smb)
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Pierce on behalf of Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity (Pierce, Matthew)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C.N.B. Construction, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity. (Diblich, Natalie)
November 16, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (mlc)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie E Diblich on behalf of Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity (Diblich, Natalie)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.N.B. Construction, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5079600.), filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diblich, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity v. C.N.B. Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity
Represented By: Natalie E Diblich
Represented By: Matthew J Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.N.B. Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?