National Labor Relations Board v. Burrink et al
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Brennden Burrink and Jennifer Burrink
Case Number: 2:2022mc00015
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board re #1 MOTION Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena, #3 Order,, Set Deadlines, #2 Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service of Proof of Service)(Dale, Michael)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Authorize Service By Alternate Means #5 ; ORDERS the NLRB to serve the Burrinks by prominently affixing copies of its application and supporting memorandum and the Courts order to show cause [DE 1, 2, 3] to the exterior door of the residence at 9764 Tall Grass Trail, Saint John, IN 46373, and mailing copies by first class mail; and ORDERS the NLRB to file a certificate of service when it has done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/31/2022. (shk)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Authorize Service by Alternative Means by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(Dale, Michael)
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board re #1 MOTION Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena, #2 Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Proof of Service)(Dale, Michael)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Brennden and Jennifer Burrink to SHOW CAUSE why the NLRB's application should not be granted, by filing a response in this Court on or before 3/25/2022. The Court ORDERS NLRB to serve Brennden and Jennifer Burrink with a copy of this order, NLRBs application for enforcement, and NLRBs supporting memorandum, by certified mail, and to file proof of service with the Court by 3/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/4/2022. (shk)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 MOTION Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(jdb)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(jdb)
March 3, 2022 **NEW CASE** **MOTION PENDING** Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Burrink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Michael S Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brennden Burrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Burrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?