Dunlap v. United States of America
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE DUNLAP
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2023cv00005
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Attorney General of the United States on 01/17/2023, filed by Lawrence Dunlap. (Hadler, Ashley)
January 20, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Civil Process Clerk on 01/11/2023, filed by Lawrence Dunlap. (Hadler, Ashley)
January 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon R Sobol, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sobol, Sheldon)
January 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (kmt)
January 9, 2023 **NEW CASE** Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (kmt)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley N Hadler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hadler, Ashley)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5122785.), filed by LAWRENCE DUNLAP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hadler, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE DUNLAP
Represented By: Ashley N Hadler
Represented By: Sheldon R Sobol, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?